NH HB622 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-135 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-135 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting collective bargaining agreements that require employees to join or contribute to a labor union.
Title
Prohibiting collective bargaining agreements that require employees to join or contribute to a labor union.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - ITL (Y: 214 N: 135 NV: 28 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-135 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 50 |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 14 |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 22 |