NH HB621 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2019; Chapter 152; Eff: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the state commission on aging.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the state commission on aging.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/01/2019; Chapter 152; Eff: 07/01/2019
2019-06-18HouseEnrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18
2019-06-18SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-06HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2377e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 40
2019-06-05SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2377e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-24SenateSpecial Order to to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-05-02SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-02SenateHearing: 04/17/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0714h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 4
2019-03-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0714h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 4
2019-03-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0714h (NT) for 03/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15
2019-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-27HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 03/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-13HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/19/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-13House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/19/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-06House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-23House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 22

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback