NH HB618 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the sale and distribution of polystyrene food service products.
Title
Relative to the sale and distribution of polystyrene food service products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-03-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 66 |
2021-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98917516497 (if necessary) |
2021-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95215897452 |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95175123874 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 57 |