NH HB618 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-26 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2738h (New Title)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-26 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2738h (New Title)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring state agencies to submit an efficiency level expenditure estimate to the commissioner of administrative services as part of the biennial budget process.
Title
Requiring state agencies to submit an efficiency level expenditure estimate to the commissioner of administrative services as part of the biennial budget process.
Sponsors
Rep. William Belvin [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. John Cebrowski [R] |
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Rep. Norman Major [R] | Rep. Kris Roberts [D] | Sen. Raymond White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-26 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2738h (New Title) | |
2011-10-26 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2738h(NT) for Jan 4 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) | |
2011-10-13 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-10-13 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-10-13 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-09-14 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-09-14 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-09-08 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/29/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-09-08 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 10:00 Amendment)== | |
2011-08-18 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/15/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-08-18 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-03-01 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.824 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-02-14 | House Continued Public Hearing: 2/14/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-01-25 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Finance; House Journal 11, PG. 193 |