NH HB617 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 265; Eff: 07/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study recycling streams and solid waste management in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study recycling streams and solid waste management in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 265; Eff: 07/19/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2344s (Rep. Gourgue): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 3
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2344s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2344s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2344s, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24A
2019-03-21SenateHearing: 03/26/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 10
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 5
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 22

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback