NH HB617 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring state police to wear a camera when interacting with the public.
Title
Requiring state police to wear a camera when interacting with the public.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/21/2016; Senate Calendar 15 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/22/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-01-06 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 89 |
2016-01-06 | House | Referred to Finance 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 89 |
2016-01-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2522h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 86 |
2016-01-06 | House | Amendment #2015-2522h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 86 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2522h for Jan 6 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 16-17 |
2015-10-07 | House | Executive Session: 10/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-10-07 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-09-29 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-09-17 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-09-16 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-09-08 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/15/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-08-04 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 8/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-02-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 232 |