NH HB617 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2522h for Jan 6 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 16-17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring state police to wear a camera when interacting with the public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring state police to wear a camera when interacting with the public.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2522h for Jan 6 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 16-17
2015-10-07HouseExecutive Session: 10/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-10-07HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-09-29HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-09-17HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-09-16HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2015-09-08HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/15/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2015-08-04HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 8/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-02-06HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-04HouseExecutive Session: 2/4/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2015-01-28HousePublic Hearing: 2/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 232

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback