NH HB615 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Enrolled 06/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the regulation of pharmacies and pharmacists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the regulation of pharmacies and pharmacists.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2460e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019
2019-06-13SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2460e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 24
2019-05-02Senate==RESCHEDULED== Hearing: 05/16/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 21
2019-04-25Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 05/15/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0773h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 2
2019-03-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0773h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 2
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0773h for 03/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 3
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-02-20HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/05/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/19/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 22

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback