NH HB615 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-145; House Journal 20, PG. 528-531
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-145; House Journal 20, PG. 528-531
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to funding for state energy efficiency programs.
Title
Relative to funding for state energy efficiency programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 210 N: 145 NV: 43 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-145; House Journal 20, PG. 528-531 |
2015-02-11 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-02-11 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 18 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 250 |
2015-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/5/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG. 232 |