NH HB615 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Laid on Table (Rep K.Rogers): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 31, PG.1059
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Laid on Table (Rep K.Rogers): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 31, PG.1059
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the New Hampshire national guard recruitment and retention scholarship fund and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to the New Hampshire national guard recruitment and retention scholarship fund and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Laid on Table (Rep K.Rogers): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 31, PG.1059 |
2013-03-20 | House | Proposed Minority Committee Amendment #2013-0969h; House Calendar 25, PG.730 |
2013-03-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0969h; House Calendar 25, PG.709 |
2013-03-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 27 (Vote 15-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 25, PG.709 |
2013-03-12 | House | Executive Session: 3/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-03-07 | House | Division I Work Session: 3/15/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Finance; House Journal 24, PG.672 |
2013-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.672 |
2013-02-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought To Pass for Mar 6 (Vote 18-0; Part I Regular Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.417 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG.202 |