NH HB615 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - House II. Remainder Effective 04/19/2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - House II. Remainder Effective 04/19/2010
Summary
Relative to organization of, reorganization of, or withdrawal from a school administrative unit and amending the charter of the Brewster Academy.
Title
Relative to organization of, reorganization of, or withdrawal from a school administrative unit and amending the charter of the Brewster Academy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | House II. Remainder Effective 04/19/2010 | |
2010-04-19 | House I. Section 1-3 Effective 06/18/2010 | |
2010-04-19 | House Signed by the Governor 04/19/2010; Chapter 0005 | |
2010-04-14 | House Enrolled; House Journal 32, PG.1589 | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 14, Pg.302 | |
2010-04-14 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #1391 (New Title) Adopted; House Journal 32, PG.1588-1589 | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #1391, New Title, Adopted | |
2010-04-14 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1254s (New Title) (Rep Rous): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 32, PG.1587 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 13, Pg.282 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1254s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13, Pg.280 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Committee Amendment 1254s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13, Pg.280 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special Order to the end of the Calendar; Senate Journal 13, Pg.275 | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1254s, New Title, 4/7/10; Senate Calendar 14A | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Hearing: March 16, 2010, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 11:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Education | |
2010-01-06 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2523h (New Title): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 6, PG.253-258 | |
2010-01-06 | House Amendment #2523h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 6, PG.253-258 | |
2009-11-30 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2523h (New Title); House Calendar 1, PG.29-34 | |
2009-11-30 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2523h (New Title) for Jan 6 Consent Calendar (vote 16-0); House Calendar 2, PG.80 | |
2009-10-30 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/19/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2009-10-21 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 12/1/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2009-10-06 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/14/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2009-03-06 | House Retained in Committee | |
2009-02-19 | House Executive Session: 3/5/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2009-02-03 | House Public Hearing: 2/17/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2009-01-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG.235 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=299&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |