NH HB613 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 17
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-04 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 17
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to governmental records exempted under the right-to-know law.
Title
Relative to governmental records exempted under the right-to-know law.
Sponsors
Rep. Tara Sad [D] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 17 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 6/4/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Hearing: 4/21/15, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0744: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1228 |
2015-03-12 | House | Amendment #0744h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1228 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0744h for Mar 11 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 429 |
2015-03-03 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 ==RECESSED== |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG. 232 |