NH HB611 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2678e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing voters to vote by absentee ballot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing voters to vote by absentee ballot.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - OTP (Y: 198 N: 163 NV: 16 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2678e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019
2019-08-08SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2678e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to after Executive Departments and Administration, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-18SenateHearing: 04/24/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:45 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-163 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 33
2019-02-21HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-21HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 11
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 22

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback