NH HB611 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to portability, availability, and renewability of health coverage.
Title
Relative to portability, availability, and renewability of health coverage.
Sponsors
Rep. William Marsh [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Lino Avellani [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] |
Rep. Karel Crawford [R] | Rep. John Fothergill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 16 |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 8 |
2017-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 21 |