NH HB611 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring legislative approval of all agreements, contracts, grants, or waivers involving the department of education or the state board of education.
Title
Requiring legislative approval of all agreements, contracts, grants, or waivers involving the department of education or the state board of education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 19 |
2015-09-09 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-09-09 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-04-30 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/12/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2015 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-11 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/20/2015 10:20 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/20/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 232 |