NH HB610 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB610
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Implementing needle exchange programs in New Hampshire.
Title
Implementing needle exchange programs in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Rep. Lino Avellani [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Karel Crawford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-08-15 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/31/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-03-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/28/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-02-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/01/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 21 |
Same As/Similar To
HB610 (Carry Over) 2017-11-01 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)