NH HB609 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 254-81; House Journal 24, PG. 880-882
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 254-81; House Journal 24, PG. 880-882
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to hydraulic fracturing.
Title
Relative to hydraulic fracturing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 254 N: 81 NV: 62 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 254-81; House Journal 24, PG. 880-882 |
2015-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 422-423 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/2/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-02-02 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Environment and Agriculture; House Journal 12, PG. 232 |