NH HB608 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2333s (Rep. M. Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the law against discrimination based on gender identity to other areas of the law prohibiting discrimination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding the law against discrimination based on gender identity to other areas of the law prohibiting discrimination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2333s (Rep. M. Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2333s, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2333s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2333s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24A
2019-05-16SenateHearing: 05/21/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:40 am; Senate Calendar 23
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0218h: Motion Adopted DV 230-122 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 50
2019-03-07HouseAmendment # 2019-0218h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 50
2019-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0218h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 14
2019-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 02/26/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback