NH HB607 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of games of chance.
Title
Relative to the regulation of games of chance.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Doucette [R] | Rep. Ross Berry [R] | Rep. Joe Sweeney [R] | Rep. Michael O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Timothy Soucy [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Sen. Denise Ricciardi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | House | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; House Journal 16 |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 20 |
2023-06-20 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/20/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-06-15 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Lang, Innis, D'Allesandro; 06/15/2023; Senate Journal 19 |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Sen. Lang Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/15/2023; Senate Journal 19 |
2023-06-12 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-1911s and Requests CofC (Reps. L. Sanborn, Janigian, Doucette, Almy): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 74 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1911s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-1911s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1911s, 05/18/2023; Senate Calendar 22A |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Hearing: 05/17/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am, on proposed amendment # 2023-1726s; Senate Calendar 22 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/12/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1024h 2023-1103h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2023 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-23 | House | FLAM # 2023-1103h (Reps. Ames, Doucette): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2023 House Journal 11 P. 50 |
2023-03-23 | House | Amendment # 2023-1024h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2023 House Journal 11 P. 47 |
2023-03-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2023-03-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1024h 03/16/2023 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 43 |
2023-03-08 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/15/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-02-24 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/07/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-02-09 | House | Public Hearing: 02/15/2023 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/15/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 22 |