NH HB607 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 6/8/2015; Chapter 124; Effective Date 6/8/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 6/8/2015; Chapter 124; Effective Date 6/8/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to fees for carrying a concealed firearm.
Title
Relative to fees for carrying a concealed firearm.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/8/2015; Chapter 124; Effective Date 6/8/2015 |
2015-05-21 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1782 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/21/2015); Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1636EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1781 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1636e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Floor Amendment #2015-1283s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/23/15; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Special Order HB 607 to the Next Session Day, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 11 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/9/15; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Hearing: 3/31/15, Room 103, State House, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 566 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 4 (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 350-351 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 8:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 232 |