NH HB605 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a scholarship for students pursuing careers in the service of children and the elderly.
Title
Establishing a scholarship for students pursuing careers in the service of children and the elderly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 75 |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar) |
2017-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 21 |