NH HB605 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-18 - House Signed By Governor 07/13/2011; Effective 09/11/2011; Chapter 0261
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-18 - House Signed By Governor 07/13/2011; Effective 09/11/2011; Chapter 0261
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the business finance authority to establish a New Hampshire innovation business job growth program.
Title
Authorizing the business finance authority to establish a New Hampshire innovation business job growth program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Thomas Beattie [R] | Rep. Marilinda Garcia [R] | Rep. Edward Moran [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Oligny [R] | Rep. Stephen Stepanek [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Sen. Raymond White [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - House - ADOPT COC REPORT #2401C (Y: 247 N: 101 NV: 49 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-18 | House Signed By Governor 07/13/2011; Effective 09/11/2011; Chapter 0261 | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1859 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-22 | House Conference Committee Report #2401c Adopted, Regular Calendar 247-101; House Journal 57, PG.1849-1851 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2401c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2011-06-16 | Senate Conference Committee Report #2011-2401c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed | |
2011-06-10 | House Conference Committee Meeting: 6/13/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, De Blois and Kelly; Senate Journal 20, Pg.567 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Sen. Prescott Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference; Senate Journal 20, Pg.567 | |
2011-05-25 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Major, Hess, Azarian, and Almy; House Journal 46, PG.1583 | |
2011-05-25 | House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1727s and Requests C of C (Rep Stepanek): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.1583 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1727s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16, Pg.320 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Committee Amendment 1727s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1727s, 5/11/11; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Hearing: 5/3/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 14, Pg.272 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0494h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.742-743 | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment #0494h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.742-743 | |
2011-03-09 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0494h; House Calendar 23, PG.644-645 | |
2011-03-09 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0494h for Mar 15 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.544 | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-02-23 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/24/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 12:30 PM)== | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/17/2011 3:15 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 11, PG. 193 |