NH HB604 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB604
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Expanding the New Hampshire vaccine association to include adult vaccines.
Title
Expanding the New Hampshire vaccine association to include adult vaccines.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Rep. Gary Woods [D] | Rep. Joyce Weston [D] | Rep. Kristina Fargo [D] |
Rep. Joe Schapiro [D] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB604-FN 10/26/2021 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 13 |
2021-10-13 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-09-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2021 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-02-17 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94563888809 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96551569054 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 56 |
Same As/Similar To
HB604 (Carry Over) 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=158&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB604 |