NH HB603 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the John and Molly Stark student debt reduction program and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing the John and Molly Stark student debt reduction program and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Burton [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Died on Table |
2017-02-15 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. White): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 28 |
2017-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/15/2017 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 18 |
2017-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 21 |