NH HB602 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB602
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reimbursements for telemedicine.
Title
Relative to reimbursements for telemedicine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-13 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-09-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/06/2021 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2021-03-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing: 03/08/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99826124489 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/02/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91285911171 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 56 |
Same As/Similar To
HB602 (Carry Over) 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207