NH HB602 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2493h for Jan 6 (Vote 12-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the use of drones.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of drones.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2493h for Jan 6 (Vote 12-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 21
2015-10-14HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2015-10-07HouseExecutive Session: 10/21/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2015-10-07HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2015-10-07HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/21/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2015-09-23HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2015-09-16HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2015-09-08HouseExecutive Session: 10/21/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2015-08-03HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/15/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2015-05-12HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/19/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2015-05-05HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2015-02-12HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-11House==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 2/11/2015 4:45 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2015-02-04House==CANCELED== Executive Session: 2/10/2015 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2015-02-04HousePublic Hearing: 2/10/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 232

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback