NH HB602 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-11 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/20/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-11 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/20/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to funding the law requiring reporting of health care acquired infections.
Title
Relative to funding the law requiring reporting of health care acquired infections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-11 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/20/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-08-23 | House Retained Bill - Insurance/Consumer Div Subcom Work Session: 10/4/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-15 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.822 | |
2011-02-02 | House Executive Session: 2/15/2011 Legislative Office Building 302 3:00 PM or Immediately Following House Session | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 193 |