NH HB601 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/19/2016; Chapter 74; Eff. 7/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to cash dispensing machine requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to cash dispensing machine requirements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-23HouseSigned by Governor Hassan 05/19/2016; Chapter 74; Eff. 7/18/2016
2016-05-12HouseEnrolled 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 46
2016-05-11SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/05/2016); Senate Journal 17
2016-04-21SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14
2016-04-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2016; Senate Calendar 15
2016-03-10SenateHearing: 03/15/2016, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2016-02-22SenateIntroduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 6
2016-01-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2527h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 58
2016-01-06HouseAmendment #2015-2527h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 58
2015-11-12HouseCommittee report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2527h for Jan 6 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 14
2015-09-29HouseExecutive Session: 10/27/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2015-09-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2015-09-08HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2015-03-06HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2015-02-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2015-02-04HousePublic Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 232

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback