NH HB601 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2527h for Jan 6 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to cash dispensing machine requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to cash dispensing machine requirements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-12HouseCommittee report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2527h for Jan 6 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 14
2015-09-29HouseExecutive Session: 10/27/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2015-09-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
2015-09-08HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2015-03-06HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2015-02-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2015-02-04HousePublic Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 232

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback