NH HB601 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring ballot measures to be in plain English.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring ballot measures to be in plain English.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-06HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.654
2013-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 6 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.409
2013-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 2/19/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2013-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 2/7/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG.202

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback