NH HB601 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-18 - House Law Without Signature 07/14/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0264; NH Constitution, Art.44, Pt.II
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to implementation of federal health care reform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to implementation of federal health care reform.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-22 - Senate - Conference Committee Report 2405 (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - ADOPT COC REPORT #2405C (Y: 254 N: 96 NV: 47 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-18 House Law Without Signature 07/14/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0264; NH Constitution, Art.44, Pt.II
2011-06-22 House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1859
2011-06-22 Senate Enrolled
2011-06-22 House Conference Committee Report #2405c Adopted, Regular Calendar 254-96; House Journal 57, PG.1847-1849
2011-06-22 Senate Conference Committee Report 2405c; Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Adopted
2011-06-16 Senate Conference Committee Report #2011-2405c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed
2011-06-15 Senate Conferee Change; Senator Bradley Replaces Senator Houde
2011-06-14 House ==RECONVENE== Conference Committee Meeting: 6/15/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2011-06-09 House Conference Committee Meeting: 6/13/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==RECESSED==
2011-06-08 Senate President Appoints: Senators White, Forrester and Houde; Senate Journal 20, Pg.567
2011-06-08 Senate Sen. Prescott Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference; Senate Journal 20, Pg.567
2011-06-01 House Speaker Appoints: Reps Hunt, Flanders, Manuse, and Taylor; House Journal 48, PG.1624
2011-06-01 House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1493s and Req C of C (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1624
2011-04-27 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 14
2011-04-27 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1493s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 14, Pg.277
2011-04-27 Senate Committee Amendment 1493s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14, Pg.277
2011-04-20 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1493s, 4/27/11; Senate Calendar 21
2011-03-31 Senate Hearing: 4/6/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 18
2011-03-23 Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 11, Pg.193
2011-03-15 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0674h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.704-705
2011-03-15 House Amendment #0674h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.704-705
2011-03-10 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0674h; House Calendar 23, PG.643
2011-03-10 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0674h for Mar 15 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.525
2011-03-01 House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2011-02-09 House Public Hearing: 2/24/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2011-01-24 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 193

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback