NH HB600 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 8-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 8-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to voter registration.
Title
Relative to voter registration.
Sponsors
Rep. Lucy Weber [D] | Rep. Sylvia Gale [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
Sen. David Pierce [D] | Rep. Larry Phillips [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-30 | House | Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 8-4) |
2014-10-14 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-08-19 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2014-01-29 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/6/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-08-28 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/11/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-08-06 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/14/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG.202 |