NH HB599 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB599
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to liens for labor and materials on property owned by an irrevocable trust.
Title
Relative to liens for labor and materials on property owned by an irrevocable trust.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) |
2019-09-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-06-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/26/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 21 |
Same As/Similar To
HB599 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar)