NH HB599 | 2017 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Establishing the office of ombudsman in the department of state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Establishing the office of ombudsman in the department of state.



2017-11-30HouseDied on Table
2017-03-08HouseLay on Table (Rep. Packard): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 116
2017-03-01HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2017-03-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 02/23/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307
2017-01-24HousePublic Hearing: 01/31/2017 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-01-20HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources

Bill Comments