NH HB599 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.412
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.412
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to appointments and reapppointments of marital masters.
Title
Relative to appointments and reapppointments of marital masters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.412 | |
2011-11-02 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2206 | |
2011-09-14 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-08-09 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/13/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-02-15 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.824 | |
2011-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/15/2011 Legislative Office Building 208 Following House Session | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 11, PG. 193 |