NH HB598 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 298-5; House Journal 26, PG. 1269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 298-5; House Journal 26, PG. 1269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of deadly force.
Title
Relative to the definition of deadly force.
Sponsors
Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Don Leeman [R] |
Rep. Richard Marple [R] | Rep. Frederick Rice [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 298-5; House Journal 26, PG. 1269 |
2015-03-12 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep Abramson); House Journal 24, PG. 766 |
2015-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 396 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/2/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 232 |