NH HB598 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.709
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.709
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a candidate from receiving the nomination of more than one party.
Title
Prohibiting a candidate from receiving the nomination of more than one party.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Brown [R] | Rep. Laura Jones [R] | Rep. Frederick Leonard [R] | Rep. William Panek [R] |
Rep. Michael Weeden [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.709 | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 14-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.529 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2011-02-08 | House Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 11, PG. 193 |