NH HB597 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0036; Effective 8/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0036; Effective 8/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a drug-free workplace for licensed health care facilities and providers.
Title
Relative to a drug-free workplace for licensed health care facilities and providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 289 N: 48 NV: 28 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0036; Effective 8/25/2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/1/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services |
2014-01-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2261h(NT) Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 289-48 |
2014-01-22 | House | Adopt Amendment #2261h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-20 | House | Propossed Committee Amendment #2261h (New Title) |
2013-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2261h(NT) for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 3 |
2013-08-09 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-08-08 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/10/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-07-19 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/6/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-06-04 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/11/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-05-28 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/4/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-05-22 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/28/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-05-15 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/21/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-03-07 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/7/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-02-26 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-02-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/26/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.202 |