NH HB597 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - House Signed By Governor 06/18/2012; Effective 07/01/2013; Chapter 0248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - House Signed By Governor 06/18/2012; Effective 07/01/2013; Chapter 0248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the child support guidelines based on an income shares model of calculating child support.
Title
Revising the child support guidelines based on an income shares model of calculating child support.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Rep. Edward Moran [R] | Rep. William Panek [R] |
Rep. Michael Weeden [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | House Signed By Governor 06/18/2012; Effective 07/01/2013; Chapter 0248 | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.2613 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | House Conference Committee Report #2412c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2595 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2412c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-30 | Senate Conference Committee Report #2012-2412c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed | |
2012-05-23 | House Conference Committee Meeting: 5/29/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Groen, Forsythe, and Houde | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Sen. Houde Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-03-07 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Moran, E.Hogan, C.Soucy, and Lovejoy; House Journal 21, PG.1253 | |
2012-03-07 | House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment and Requests C of C (Rep Moran): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1253 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0133s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 2, Pg.66 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Committee Amendment 0133s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 2, Pg.65 | |
2012-01-10 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0133s, 1/18/12; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.519 | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 6/1/11; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Hearing: 4/28/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11, Pg.193 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.694 | |
2011-03-09 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 15 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.523 | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/7/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2011-02-16 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/24/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2011-02-16 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 2/16/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 11, PG. 192 |