NH HB596 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.781
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.781
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to service of notice of civil actions.
Title
Relative to service of notice of civil actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.781 |
2013-03-06 | House | Special Order to Mar 13 Without Objection; House Journal 24, PG.703 |
2013-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 14-1; Part I, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.518 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG.202 |