NH HB595 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 178; Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 178; Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the administration of the tobacco tax.
Title
Relative to the administration of the tobacco tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 178; Eff: 01/01/2020 |
2019-06-12 | House | Enrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 04/24/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 19A |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/07/2019 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 6 |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 21 |