NH HB593 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB593
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-14 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-14 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Granting group II retirement system status to certain positions in the department of corrections.
Title
Granting group II retirement system status to certain positions in the department of corrections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-03 | House | Executive Session: 11/01/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-10-11 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/26/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-08-16 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-05-16 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 06/06/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-03-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2017 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2017-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 20 |
Same As/Similar To
HB593 (Carry Over) 2017-11-14 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar)