NH HB592 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 294; I. Sec. 1-4 Eff: 09/27/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 07/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 294; I. Sec. 1-4 Eff: 09/27/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 07/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to OHRV operation and license.
Title
Relative to OHRV operation and license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - OTP (Y: 202 N: 116 NV: 44 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 294; I. Sec. 1-4 Eff: 09/27/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 07/29/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2559c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Conference Committee Report 2559c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 32 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2559c; 06/27/2019 |
2019-06-13 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/18/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Watters, Hennessey, Birdsell; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Watters Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-23 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Sykes, Pickering, O'Brien, Steven Smith 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 11 |
2019-05-23 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1852s and Requests CofC (Rep. Sykes): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 11 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1852s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1852s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1852s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 202-116 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 44 |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/14/2019 (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 13 |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing: 02/26/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 21 |