NH HB591 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to suction dredging in the surface waters of the state.
Title
Relative to suction dredging in the surface waters of the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/29/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2017, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0260h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 19 |
2017-02-15 | House | Amendment #2017-0260h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 19 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0260h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 15 |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 20 |