NH HB590 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB590
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-18 - Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-18 - Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a state bank.
Title
Establishing a state bank.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Fraser [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. John Cloutier [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] |
Rep. Richard Abel [D] | Rep. Kermit Williams [D] | Rep. John Bordenet [D] | Rep. Christopher Herbert [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | House | Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302 |
2018-08-22 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building302 |
2018-01-03 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 32 |
2017-11-03 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 12-1; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-11 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-10-11 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-10-03 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-10-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/31/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-10-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-02-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 20 |
Same As/Similar To
HB590 (Carry Over) 2017-11-03 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 12-1; Consent Calendar)