NH HB587 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to organ donation on a driver's license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to organ donation on a driver's license.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2397s (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2397s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateSen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2019-2397s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2348s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2348s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24A
2019-03-13SenateHearing: 03/19/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 14
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0132h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 47
2019-02-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0132h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 47
2019-02-05HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-05HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0132h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 18-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 16
2019-01-23HouseExecutive Session: 01/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-23HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback