NH HB587 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB587

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 167; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to conversion therapy seeking to change a person's sexual orientation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to conversion therapy seeking to change a person's sexual orientation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - Reconsider (Y: 158 N: 187 NV: 16 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2018-05-10 - House - CofC (Y: 163 N: 182 NV: 16 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment 1654s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Committee Amendment 1502s (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - House - OTP (Y: 179 N: 171 NV: 15 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - ITL (Y: 171 N: 177 NV: 17 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - House - Reconsider (Y: 178 N: 169 NV: 17 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - House - ITL (Y: 166 N: 165 NV: 29 Abs: 32) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 167; Eff. 1/1/2019
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-05-10HouseReconsider concurrence with amendment 1654s (Rep. White): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 158-187 05/10/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1654s (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1654s and Requests CofC (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 163-182 05/10/2018
2018-04-19SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1654s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-19SenateSen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment # 2018-1654s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-19SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1502s, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Amendment Failed; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-19SenateSpecial Order to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1502s, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17
2018-04-05SenateHearing: 04/10/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 16
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5
2018-02-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 179-171 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 35
2018-02-08HouseFLAM # 2018-0438h (Rep. J. Edwards): Amendment Failed DV 167-183 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 35
2018-02-08HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 171-177 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 33
2018-02-08HouseReconsider HB 587 (Rep. Parkhurst): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 178-169 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 31
2018-01-09HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 166-165 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 35
2018-01-03HouseSpecial Order to 1/9/2018 Without Objection House Journal 1 P. 104
2017-11-01HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2017-11-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar)
2017-10-11HouseExecutive Session: 10/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-08-15HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/30/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2017-02-24HouseRetained in Committee
2017-02-24HouseExecutive Session: 02/23/2017 Legislative Office Building 205
2017-02-15House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2017-02-08House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/14/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2017-01-20HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 20

Same As/Similar To

HB587 (Carry Over) 2017-11-01 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=200&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB587
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=160&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=160
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=25&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0587&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB587&ddlsponsors=&lsr=200
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=33&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0587&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB587&ddlsponsors=&lsr=200
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=34&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0587&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB587&ddlsponsors=&lsr=200
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=35&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0587&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB587&ddlsponsors=&lsr=200
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=178&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB0587&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB587&ddlsponsors=&lsr=200
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=179&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB0587&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB587&ddlsponsors=&lsr=200
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=180&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB0587&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB587&ddlsponsors=&lsr=200
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=226&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0587&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB587&ddlsponsors=&lsr=200
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=227&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0587&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB587&ddlsponsors=&lsr=200

Bill Comments

feedback