NH HB587 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2317h for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2317h for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to medical examination requirements for commercial drivers' licenses.
Title
Relative to medical examination requirements for commercial drivers' licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Tasker [R] | Rep. Pamela Tucker [R] | Rep. Mark Warden [R] | Rep. Bruce Hodgdon [R] |
Rep. Romeo Danais [R] | Rep. Maureen Mann [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Joe Duarte [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2317h for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2013-10-15 | House | ==TIME CHANGE==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-10-15 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/29/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-08-20 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-07-23 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-02-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG.201 |