NH HB586 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Remove from Table (Rep. Dolan) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 164-175 02/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to training and procedures for zoning and planning boards and relative to financial investments and incentives for affordable housing development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to training and procedures for zoning and planning boards and relative to financial investments and incentives for affordable housing development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - House - Remove from Table (Y: 164 N: 175 NV: 17 Abs: 42) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Remove from Table (Y: 164 N: 175 NV: 24 Abs: 35) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseRemove from Table (Rep. Dolan) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 164-175 02/25/2021
2021-02-25HouseLay on Table (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted DV 175-172 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 2
2021-02-24HouseSpecial Order to first order of business on 2/25/2021 (Rep. Dolan): Motion Adopted DV 184-158 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 86
2021-02-18HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-02-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 23
2021-01-27HouseExecutive Session: 02/08/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96815613466
2021-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95927066667 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-13HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 55

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback