NH HB586 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
Hearing: Oct 23 @ 12:30 pm in Legislative Office Building 302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to lender-placed insurance on motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to lender-placed insurance on motor vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-20HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-09-11HouseExecutive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-09-03HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-06-17HouseFull Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-08HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-28House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-27HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback